NJ A3887 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S834
Note: Carry Over of previous A2655
Note: Carry Over of previous A2655
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes requirements concerning provision of postpartum care, pregnancy loss, and stillbirth information and development of personalized postpartum care plans.
Title
Establishes requirements concerning provision of postpartum care, pregnancy loss, and stillbirth information and development of personalized postpartum care plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Womens Affairs Committee Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Women's Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S912 (Same As) 2024-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S834 (Carry Over) 2024-01-04 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2655 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S834 (Carry Over) 2024-01-04 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2655 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading