NJ A3882 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-18 - Approved P.L.2016, c.30.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-18 - Approved P.L.2016, c.30.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Changes submission and notice requirements for short-term and long-term financing for environmental infrastructure projects.
Title
Changes submission and notice requirements for short-term and long-term financing for environmental infrastructure projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Spencer [D] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Rep. Marlene Caride [D] | Rep. James Kennedy [D] |
Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2287 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2016, c.30. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Substituted for S2287 (1R) |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2287 (Same As) 2016-06-27 - Substituted by A3882 (1R)