NJ S2287 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Substituted by A3882 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Substituted by A3882 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Changes submission and notice requirements for short-term and long-term financing for environmental infrastructure projects.
Title
Changes submission and notice requirements for short-term and long-term financing for environmental infrastructure projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Senate | Substituted by A3882 (1R) |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment (30-0) (Smith) |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3882 (Same As) 2016-08-18 - Approved P.L.2016, c.30.