NJ A3834 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-11 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Jasey)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"The Child and Family Suicide Prevention Act;" requires training related to screening for suicide prevention for pediatricians, physician assistants, and advanced practice nurses.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"The Child and Family Suicide Prevention Act;" requires training related to screening for suicide prevention for pediatricians, physician assistants, and advanced practice nurses.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-11AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Jasey)
2014-12-11AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2014-10-23AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3068 (Same As) 2015-06-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback