NJ A3768 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1178
Note: Carry Foward to future S898
Note: Carry Foward to future S898
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits corporations to use blockchain technology for certain recordkeeping requirements.
Title
Permits corporations to use blockchain technology for certain recordkeeping requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Rep. Christopher DePhillips [R] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3768 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A3768 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2462 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3768 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2462 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee