NJ A3754 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on October 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-04 - Approved P.L.2018, c.126.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts persons providing hair braiding services from licensure requirement, requires registration of hair braiding establishments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts persons providing hair braiding services from licensure requirement, requires registration of hair braiding establishments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 70 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2510 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-04SenateApproved P.L.2018, c.126.
2018-09-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-13)
2018-09-27SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
2018-09-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (70-5-3)
2018-08-27Assembly2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
2018-08-27AssemblyFirst Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
2018-08-27AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
2018-07-01SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)
2018-07-01SenateSubstituted for S2510
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-11SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-06-07AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2018-05-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2510 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - Substituted by A3754

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback