NJ A374 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Approved P.L.2017, c.108.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits MVC from imposing duplicate license or identification card fee and digitized picture fee if duplicate is requested to reflect change in organ donor status.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits MVC from imposing duplicate license or identification card fee and digitized picture fee if duplicate is requested to reflect change in organ donor status.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2462 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-13AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.108.
2017-05-22AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
2017-02-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2017-02-13SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2017-02-13SenateSubstituted for S2462 (1R)
2017-01-30SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-07-14SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-07-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-02-29SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
2016-02-18AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
2016-02-08AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3710 (Carry Over) 2014-09-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S2462 (Same As) 2017-02-13 - Substituted by A374 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback