NJ S2462 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3710
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Substituted by A374 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Substituted by A374 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits MVC from imposing duplicate license or identification card fee and digitized picture fee if duplicate is requested to reflect change in organ donor status.
Title
Prohibits MVC from imposing duplicate license or identification card fee and digitized picture fee if duplicate is requested to reflect change in organ donor status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | Substituted by A374 (1R) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A374 (Same As) 2017-07-13 - Approved P.L.2017, c.108.
A3710 (Carry Over) 2014-09-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A3710 (Carry Over) 2014-09-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee