NJ A3696 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-10 - Approved P.L.2017, c.27.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-10 - Approved P.L.2017, c.27.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates sales and use tax on certain transportation services provided by a limousine operator.*
Title
Eliminates sales and use tax on certain transportation services provided by a limousine operator.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2315 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2315 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.27. |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-3) |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (33-0) (Sarlo) |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment (33-0) (Sarlo) |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Substituted for S2315 |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-6) |
2016-10-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2315 (Same As) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by A3696 (1R)