NJ A3678 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4258
Note: Carry Over of previous A5880
Note: Carry Over of previous A5880
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-01-30 - Substituted by S2423
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-01-30 - Substituted by S2423
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Renames Juvenile Justice Commission as Youth Justice Commission.
Title
Renames Juvenile Justice Commission as Youth Justice Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-30 | Assembly | Substituted by S2423 |
2024-12-16 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2423 (Same As) 2025-03-17 - Approved P.L.2025, c.35.
S4258 (Carry Over) 2023-12-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5880 (Carry Over) 2023-12-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S4258 (Carry Over) 2023-12-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5880 (Carry Over) 2023-12-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee