NJ A3590 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1268
Note: Carry Foward to future S1352
Note: Carry Foward to future S332
Note: Carry Over of previous S1524
Note: Carry Over of previous A3541
Note: Carry Foward to future S1352
Note: Carry Foward to future S332
Note: Carry Over of previous S1524
Note: Carry Over of previous A3541
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises requirements for disclosure of a breach of security of certain computerized records containing personal information.
Title
Revises requirements for disclosure of a breach of security of certain computerized records containing personal information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3590 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A3590 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A3590 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1225 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1524 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3541 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A3590 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A3590 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1225 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1524 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3541 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3590 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A4000/3590_I1.HTM |