NJ A1268 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A548
Note: Carry Foward to future S3028
Note: Carry Over of previous A3590
Note: Carry Over of previous S1225
Note: Carry Foward to future S3028
Note: Carry Over of previous A3590
Note: Carry Over of previous S1225
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises requirements for disclosure of a breach of security of certain computerized records containing personal information.
Title
Revises requirements for disclosure of a breach of security of certain computerized records containing personal information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1268 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A1268 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A3590 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1225 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1352 (Same As) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1268 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A3590 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1225 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1352 (Same As) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A1268 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A1500/1268_I1.HTM |