NJ A3528 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Substituted by S1677
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Substituted by S1677
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits DCA to nominate a municipality as a qualified municipality for purposes of NJ Redevelopment Authority program participation.
Title
Permits DCA to nominate a municipality as a qualified municipality for purposes of NJ Redevelopment Authority program participation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Substituted by S1677 |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1677 (Same As) 2015-05-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.56.