NJ A3520 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S2153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S2153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires NJTA to study impact of constructing rail stations at certain park and ride facilities.
Title
Requires NJTA to study impact of constructing rail stations at certain park and ride facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Substituted by S2153 |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2153 (Same As) 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.195.