NJ S2153 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.195.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.195.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires NJTA to study impact of constructing rail stations at certain park and ride facilities.
Title
Requires NJTA to study impact of constructing rail stations at certain park and ride facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Gordon [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3520 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3520 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-07 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.195. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-18-4) |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Sumter) (52-24-0) |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (McGuckin) |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Substituted for A3520 |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2016-09-15 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3520 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S2153