NJ A3283 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3534
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Implements reporting requirements for agricultural tourism pilot program; creates task force.
Title
Implements reporting requirements for agricultural tourism pilot program; creates task force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3534 (Carry Over) 2014-07-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee