NJ A3246 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4820
Note: Carry Over of previous S2853
Note: Carry Over of previous S2853
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-21 - Substituted by S765 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-21 - Substituted by S765 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits carrier from precluding dentist from billing covered person under certain circumstances.
Title
Prohibits carrier from precluding dentist from billing covered person under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-21 | Assembly | Substituted by S765 (2R) |
2023-12-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S765 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.207.
A4820 (Carry Over) 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2853 (Carry Over) 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4820 (Carry Over) 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2853 (Carry Over) 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee