NJ S2853 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S765
Note: Carry Foward to future A3246
Note: Carry Foward to future A3246
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits carrier from precluding dentist from billing covered person under certain circumstances.
Title
Prohibits carrier from precluding dentist from billing covered person under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (28-0) |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2853 (Carry Over) 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2853 (Carry Over) 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4820 (Same As) 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2853 (Carry Over) 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4820 (Same As) 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee