NJ A3186 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A349
Note: Carry Over of previous S1749
Note: Carry Over of previous S1749
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for student recipients of educational opportunity funds to be exempt from 20 hour weekly work requirement ordinarily required for student SNAP participation.
Title
Provides for student recipients of educational opportunity funds to be exempt from 20 hour weekly work requirement ordinarily required for student SNAP participation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A349 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S1749 (Carry Over) 2023-02-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S2591 (Same As) 2024-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1749 (Carry Over) 2023-02-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S2591 (Same As) 2024-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3186 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A3500/3186_I1.HTM |