NJ A3173 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5174
Note: Carry Over of previous S3611
Note: Carry Over of previous S3611
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various changes to address sexual assault and child abuse and neglect involving military personnel; addresses protection, penalties, enforcement, jurisdiction, and victim compensation matters.
Title
Makes various changes to address sexual assault and child abuse and neglect involving military personnel; addresses protection, penalties, enforcement, jurisdiction, and victim compensation matters.
Sponsors
Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Aura Dunn [R] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] |
Rep. Alex Sauickie [R] | Rep. Victoria Flynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5174 (Carry Over) 2023-03-23 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S3611 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2750 (Same As) 2024-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3611 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2750 (Same As) 2024-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee