NJ A3137 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1480
Note: Carry Over of previous A2606
Note: Carry Over of previous S1338
Note: Carry Over of previous A2606
Note: Carry Over of previous S1338
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires MVC to check Social Security Administration records and mark deceased individuals in MVC database once per month.
Title
Requires MVC to check Social Security Administration records and mark deceased individuals in MVC database once per month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3137 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A2606 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2241 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S1338 (Carry Over) 2018-03-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2606 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2241 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S1338 (Carry Over) 2018-03-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3137 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3500/3137_I1.HTM |