NJ A2606 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3137
Note: Carry Foward to future S2241
Note: Carry Over of previous S3071
Note: Carry Foward to future S2241
Note: Carry Over of previous S3071
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires MVC to check Social Security Administration records and mark deceased individuals in MVC database once per month.
Title
Requires MVC to check Social Security Administration records and mark deceased individuals in MVC database once per month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2018-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2606 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2606 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1338 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3071 (Carry Over) 2017-03-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A2606 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1338 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3071 (Carry Over) 2017-03-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee