NJ A3101 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2090

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-5)
Status: Engrossed on November 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases minimum annual amounts for appropriation for certain arts, historical heritage, and tourism purposes from hotel and motel occupancy fee revenues.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases minimum annual amounts for appropriation for certain arts, historical heritage, and tourism purposes from hotel and motel occupancy fee revenues.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2019-11-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-11-14AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-02-08AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee

Same As/Similar To

S247 (Same As) 2018-02-26 - Senate Amendment (32-0) (Van Drew)
S2090 (Carry Over) 2016-10-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback