NJ A2991 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3183
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Attorney General to provide identity theft passport to certain victims of identity theft.
Title
Requires Attorney General to provide identity theft passport to certain victims of identity theft.
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] |
Rep. Amy Handlin [R] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-0) |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2991 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)