NJ A2888 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates Office of Clean Energy in BPU.*
Title
Creates Office of Clean Energy in BPU.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 46 N: 25 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2733 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2733 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (46-25-0) |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-3) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S2733 (SCS) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Smith) |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (45-32-0) |
2012-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2733 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A2888 (1R)