NJ A2511 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - Approved P.L.2017, c.236.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires life insurers to use federal death master file to identify potential matches.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires life insurers to use federal death master file to identify potential matches.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2211 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-13AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.236.
2017-07-31AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-0-0)
2017-07-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2017-06-29SenatePassed by the Senate (35-0)
2017-06-29SenateSubstituted for S2211 (SCS)
2017-06-19SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-06-16SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2016-06-16AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
2016-06-02AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2016-02-04AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2211 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - Substituted by A2511 (ACS/1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback