NJ S2211 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Substituted by A2511 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires life insurers to use federal death master file to identify potential matches.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires life insurers to use federal death master file to identify potential matches.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29SenateSubstituted by A2511 (ACS/1R)
2017-06-19SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2016-05-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2511 (Same As) 2017-09-13 - Approved P.L.2017, c.236.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback