NJ A2366 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2262
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.82.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.82.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to develop New Jersey Report Card of Hospital Maternity Care.
Title
Requires DOH to develop New Jersey Report Card of Hospital Maternity Care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1786 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.82. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Substituted for S1786 |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1786 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A2366
A2262 (Carry Over) 2017-03-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2262 (Carry Over) 2017-03-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee