NJ S1786 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2262
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A2366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A2366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to develop New Jersey Report Card of Hospital Maternity Care.
Title
Requires DOH to develop New Jersey Report Card of Hospital Maternity Care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Substituted by A2366 |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2366 (Same As) 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.82.
A2262 (Carry Over) 2017-03-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2262 (Carry Over) 2017-03-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee