NJ A2280 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Approved P.L.2014, c.54.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain police vehicles to be equipped with cameras.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain police vehicles to be equipped with cameras.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1305 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1305 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-10SenateApproved P.L.2014, c.54.
2014-06-26SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-3)
2014-06-26SenateSubstituted for S1305
2014-06-16SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2014-06-02SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2014-05-22AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (48-24-5)
2014-05-08AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2014-02-06AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2014-02-06AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1305 (Same As) 2014-06-26 - Substituted by A2280

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback