NJ S1305 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Substituted by A2280
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Substituted by A2280
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain police vehicles to be equipped with cameras.
Title
Requires certain police vehicles to be equipped with cameras.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Senate | Substituted by A2280 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2280 (Same As) 2014-09-10 - Approved P.L.2014, c.54.