NJ A2190 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Enrolled on December 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires school districts to incorporate instruction in grades six through 12 on law and meaning of consent for physical contact and sexual activity as part of Student Learning Standards in Comprehensive Health and Physical Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires school districts to incorporate instruction in grades six through 12 on law and meaning of consent for physical contact and sexual activity as part of Student Learning Standards in Comprehensive Health and Physical Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3108 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-17SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
2018-12-17SenateSubstituted for S3108
2018-10-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-22SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
2018-02-15AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
2018-02-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-08AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3108 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A2190

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback