NJ A2190 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.16.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.16.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to incorporate instruction in grades six through 12 on law and meaning of consent for physical contact and sexual activity as part of Student Learning Standards in Comprehensive Health and Physical Education.
Title
Requires school districts to incorporate instruction in grades six through 12 on law and meaning of consent for physical contact and sexual activity as part of Student Learning Standards in Comprehensive Health and Physical Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3108 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.16. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Substituted for S3108 |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3108 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A2190