NJ A2031 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4498
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-9)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Approved P.L.2019, c.58.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-9)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Approved P.L.2019, c.58.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Enhances enforcement and oversight of mental health condition and substance use disorder parity laws.**
Title
Enhances enforcement and oversight of mental health condition and substance use disorder parity laws.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1339 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1339 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.58. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-3-0) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (36-0) (Kean) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment (38-0) (Kean) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Substituted for S1339 (SCS/1R) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-2-2) |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4498 (Carry Over) 2017-06-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1339 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A2031 (ACS/2R)
S1339 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A2031 (ACS/2R)