NJ A4498 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expands health insurance coverage for behavioral health services and autism and enhances enforcement and oversight of mental health parity laws. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands health insurance coverage for behavioral health services and autism and enhances enforcement and oversight of mental health parity laws. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2017-06-08AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (67-5-5)
2017-05-22AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Tucker)
2017-01-30AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-01-19AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2919 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback