NJ A2005 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides corporation business tax and gross income tax credits for qualified investment in certain biotechnology businesses.
Title
Provides corporation business tax and gross income tax credits for qualified investment in certain biotechnology businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2012-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (48-25-3) |
2012-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-12-06 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1948 (Same As) 2012-05-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee