NJ A1880 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-25 - Substituted by S927
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-25 - Substituted by S927
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State Auditor review of certain Department of Corrections privatization contracts.
Title
Requires State Auditor review of certain Department of Corrections privatization contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Milam [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S927 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S927 (Same As) 2012-08-20 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A1880 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A2000/1880_I1.HTM |