NJ A1726 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.270.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.270.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends "Flood Hazard Area Control Act" to require DEP to take certain actions concerning delineations of flood hazard areas and floodplains.*
Title
Amends "Flood Hazard Area Control Act" to require DEP to take certain actions concerning delineations of flood hazard areas and floodplains.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S308 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S308 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S308 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S308 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.270. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2015-12-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (62-2-0) |
2015-11-09 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2015-11-09 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Substituted for S308 (1R) |
2014-09-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-6-0) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S308 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A1726 (1R)