NJ A1677 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1704

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Suspends fines for certain first-time paperwork violations committed by small businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suspends fines for certain first-time paperwork violations committed by small businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1704 (Carry Over) 2017-12-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2347 (Same As) 2018-04-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback