NJ A1704 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1677
Note: Carry Foward to future S2347
Note: Carry Over of previous A4729
Note: Carry Foward to future S2347
Note: Carry Over of previous A4729
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Suspends fines for certain first-time paperwork violations committed by small businesses.
Title
Suspends fines for certain first-time paperwork violations committed by small businesses.
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] |
Rep. Kevin Rooney [R] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1704 (Carry Over) 2017-12-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1704 (Carry Over) 2017-12-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4729 (Carry Over) 2015-11-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1501 (Same As) 2017-12-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1704 (Carry Over) 2017-12-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4729 (Carry Over) 2015-11-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1501 (Same As) 2017-12-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee