NJ A1649 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1760

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-4)
Status: Passed on November 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Approved P.L.2020, c.125.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Daniel's Law" prohibits disclosure of certain personal information of active, formely active, and retired judicial officers, prosecutors, and law enforcement officers, and their family members; establishes crime and civil action for disclosing such information.***

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Daniel's Law" prohibits disclosure of certain personal information of active, formely active, and retired judicial officers, prosecutors, and law enforcement officers, and their family members; establishes crime and civil action for disclosing such information.***

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2797 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-20AssemblyApproved P.L.2020, c.125.
2020-11-16AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
2020-11-16AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2020-11-16SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2020-10-29SenateSenate Amendment (33-0) (Cryan)
2020-10-29SenateSubstituted for S2797/2925 (SCS)
2020-10-22SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-10-22SenateTransferred to Senate Judiciary Committee
2020-10-08SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
2020-09-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (79-0-0)
2020-09-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-08-13AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-08-13AssemblyTransferred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1760 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S2925 (Same As) 2020-10-22 - Combined with S2797 (SCS)
S3021 (Same As) 2020-10-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2797 (Same As) 2020-10-29 - Substituted by A1649 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback