NJ S2797 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on August 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Substituted by A1649 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits disclosure of certain personal information of active, formely active, and retired judicial officers, prosecutors, and law enforcement officers, and their family members; establishes crime and civil action for disclosing such information.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits disclosure of certain personal information of active, formely active, and retired judicial officers, prosecutors, and law enforcement officers, and their family members; establishes crime and civil action for disclosing such information.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-29SenateSubstituted by A1649 (2R)
2020-10-22SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2020-08-03SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1649 (Same As) 2020-11-20 - Approved P.L.2020, c.125.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback