NJ A1465 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Decriminalizes possession of 15 grams or less of marijuana, imposes civil penalties, and establishes fund for drug education.*
Title
Decriminalizes possession of 15 grams or less of marijuana, imposes civil penalties, and establishes fund for drug education.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2012-06-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (44-31-2) |
2012-05-24 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Gusciora) |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |