NJ A1451 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3168

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.261.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits small, women owned, or minority owned businesses located in designated regional centers or planning areas to qualify for loans from EDA as if located in designated urban center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits small, women owned, or minority owned businesses located in designated regional centers or planning areas to qualify for loans from EDA as if located in designated urban center.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1030 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.261.
2017-12-18SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-0)
2017-12-18SenateSubstituted for S1030
2017-12-04SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-06-22SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-06-22AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (67-8-1)
2016-04-04AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-02-22AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3168 (Carry Over) 2015-01-12 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1030 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A1451

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback