NJ S1030 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3168
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A1451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A1451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits small, women owned, or minority owned businesses located in designated regional centers or planning areas to qualify for loans from EDA as if located in designated urban center.
Title
Permits small, women owned, or minority owned businesses located in designated regional centers or planning areas to qualify for loans from EDA as if located in designated urban center.
Sponsors
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Senate | Substituted by A1451 |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1451 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.261.
A3168 (Carry Over) 2015-01-12 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A3168 (Carry Over) 2015-01-12 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading