NJ A1285 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3377
Note: Carry Over of previous S1178
Note: Carry Over of previous S1178
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.71.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.71.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes procedures for awarding of design-build contracts.
Title
Establishes procedures for awarding of design-build contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Rep. William Moen [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2874 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2874 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.71. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Substituted for S2874 (SS) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (67-3-0) |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Greenwald) |
2020-11-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-09 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3377 (Carry Over) 2018-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S2874 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Substituted by A1285 (4R)
S1178 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2874 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Substituted by A1285 (4R)
S1178 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee