NJ S2874 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1421
Note: Carry Over of previous S1178
Note: Carry Over of previous A3377
Note: Carry Over of previous S1178
Note: Carry Over of previous A3377
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by A1285 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by A1285 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes procedures for awarding of design-build contracts.
Title
Establishes procedures for awarding of design-build contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Substituted by A1285 (4R) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senate Substitution (28-1) (Singleton) |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2874 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Substituted by A1285 (4R)
A1285 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.71.
S1178 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3377 (Carry Over) 2018-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A1285 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.71.
S1178 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3377 (Carry Over) 2018-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee