NJ A1241 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Approved P.L.2013, c.126.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Approved P.L.2013, c.126.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Increases penalties for violations committed by precious metals buyers and requires weights and measures officers to seize scales under certain circumstances.
Title
Increases penalties for violations committed by precious metals buyers and requires weights and measures officers to seize scales under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Ruben Ramos [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] |
Sen. Donald Norcross [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S523 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S523 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.126. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Substituted for S523 (1R) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment (33-0) (Norcross) |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2012-06-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S523 (Same As) 2013-05-13 - Substituted by A1241 (1R)