NJ A1219 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3684
Note: Carry Over of previous S3366
Note: Carry Over of previous S3366
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.436.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.436.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires owner notification of rabies testing protocol prior to testing of owner's animal for rabies.
Title
Requires owner notification of rabies testing protocol prior to testing of owner's animal for rabies.
Sponsors
Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Erik Peterson [R] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 75 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1054 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 75 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1054 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.436. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Substituted for S1054 (1R) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3684 (Carry Over) 2018-03-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S1054 (Same As) 2021-12-02 - Substituted by A1219 (2R)
S3366 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S1054 (Same As) 2021-12-02 - Substituted by A1219 (2R)
S3366 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading