NJ S1054 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3366
Note: Carry Over of previous A3684
Note: Carry Over of previous A3684
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Substituted by A1219 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Substituted by A1219 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires owner notification of rabies testing protocol prior to testing of owner's animal for rabies.
Title
Requires owner notification of rabies testing protocol prior to testing of owner's animal for rabies.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-02 | Senate | Substituted by A1219 (2R) |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment (34-0) (Stack) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1219 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.436.
S3366 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3684 (Carry Over) 2018-03-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S3366 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3684 (Carry Over) 2018-03-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee